Croaker Sr. v. Saul
Plaintiff: Charles Dean Croaker, Sr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2019cv01501
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charles Dean Croaker, Sr. Andrew Saul served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed upon Attorney General of USA, DOJ, #2 Summons Executed upon Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI, SSA)(Chermol, David) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMG).
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (kt)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/11/2019. (TJB)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David F. Chermol for Charles Dean Croaker, Sr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/11/2019. (JGK)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (KNK)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz per Social Security List. Please use case number 19-cv-1501 (DTS). (KNK)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David F. Chermol. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6924308 filed by Charles Dean Croaker. (Olson, Edward)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Charles Dean Croaker. (Olson, Edward)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Charles Dean Croaker. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croaker Sr. v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dean Croaker, Sr.
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?