Wilkes v. Biffs,Inc.

Plaintiff: Sharon Wilkes
Defendant: Biffs' Board of Directors, Biffs,Inc. and Biffs, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01504
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Text-only) ORDER on #4 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall file and serve her Amended Complaint within 21 days of this Order. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint no later than 21 days from the date of service of the Amended Complaint. Because Defendants have not yet appeared in this matter, Plaintiff shall provide them a copy of this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/11/2019. (JRE)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, To Amend Complaint and Extend Time to Answer by Sharon Wilkes. (Neff, Frederick)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Biffs' Board of Directors, Biffs, Inc. (MMP)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1504 JRT/TNL. (MMP)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Biffs, Inc., and Biffs' Board of Directors (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6924953) filed by Sharon Denise Wilkes. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Neff, Frederick) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkes v. Biffs,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Wilkes
Represented By: Frederick L Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biffs' Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biffs,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biffs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?