Lind v. Host International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jon Lind and Jon J. Lind
Defendant: Host International, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01509
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jon J. Lind . (Ho, Martin)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/16/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. HMSHost Corporation is a corporate parent of Defendant Host International, Inc. (Orozco, Pablo)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Host International, Inc.. (Orozco, Pablo)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1509 ECT/HB. (MMG)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number pending (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6925616) filed by Host International, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Orozco, Pablo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lind v. Host International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Host International, Inc.
Represented By: Pablo Orozco
Represented By: Joseph G Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Lind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon J. Lind
Represented By: Martin B Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?