Mwassa v. Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS)
Plaintiff: Paulo K. Mwassa
Defendant: Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS)
Case Number: 0:2019cv01511
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS). (Lindsay, Meggen)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letters due by 8/28/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MME) cc:Paulo K. Mwassa. Modified text on 7/18/2019 (MMG).
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Paulo K. Mwassa. (lmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Paulo K. Mwassa. (lmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Paulo K. Mwassa.(lmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Paulo K. Mwassa. (lmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Paulo K. Mwassa.(lmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Paulo K. Mwassa.(lmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Paulo K. Mwassa. (lmb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS). (Phillips, Penelope)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS). Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS) served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Affidavit of Service)(MMP) Document QC'd on 6/27/2019 (JGK).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE/EEOC Right to SUE LETTER filed by Paulo K. Mwassa. (KNK)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS) (filing fee $400, receipt number 3-15580) filed by Paulo K. Mwassa. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). cc: Paulo (KNK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mwassa v. Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paulo K. Mwassa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbyterian Homes and Services (PHS)
Represented By: Meggen E Lindsay
Represented By: Penelope J Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?