Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01513
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT A re #11 Reply to Counterclaim. (Bergstrom, Adina)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association. (Attachments: DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-INSTRUCTED TO REFILE. #1 Exhibit A) (Bergstrom, Adina) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (MMG).
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE. REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A). (Bergstrom, Adina) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (lmb).
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Ayers, Bradley)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association. (Bergstrom, Adina)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association. filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Ayers, Bradley)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Compliance re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, bySavanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association. (Bergstrom, Adina)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (CLK)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1513 ECT/TNL. (CLK)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adina R Bergstrom on behalf of Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association. (Bergstrom, Adina)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6926154) filed by Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bergstrom, Adina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savanna Grove Coach Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Adina R Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley J Ayers
Represented By: Eric G Nasstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?