CCDB Partners v. DKS Systems, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CCDB Partners d/b/a TourPro Software and CCDB Partners
Defendant: Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn, DKS Systems, LLC, Keith's Computer Services and Keith Hochschild
Case Number: 0:2019cv01541
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General . Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/30/2019. (HAM) cc: Hochschild. (kt)
July 29, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General on Keith Hochschild (Homolka, Kate)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn.(Homolka, Kate)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #21 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn.(Homolka, Kate)
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Homolka, Kate)
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #21 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Homolka, Kate)
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn. (Homolka, Kate)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Keith Hochschild. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMP) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Keith Hochschild.(lmb)
July 5, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DKS Systems, LLC re #17 Answer to Complaint Served on Defendants Keith Hochschild and Keith's Computer Services (Dohm, Kelly)
July 5, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant DKS System LLC's ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff filed by DKS Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dohm, Kelly)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly C Dohm on behalf of DKS Systems, LLC. (Dohm, Kelly)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn. (Marquet, Jonathan)
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn AMENDED Notice of Appearance (Marquet, Jonathan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn. (Marquet, Jonathan)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Defendants Midwest and Sinn are granted through July 29, 2019 to answer and/or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/26/2019. (HAM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Homolka, Kate)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Complaint by Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn. Jointly Signed by CCDB Partners dba TourPro Software. (Homolka, Kate)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CCDB Partners. Keith's Computer Services served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Bushnell, Sarah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CCDB Partners. Keith Hochschild served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Bushnell, Sarah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CCDB Partners. DKS Systems, LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Bushnell, Sarah)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff CCDB Partners. (Bushnell, Sarah)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Bushnell, Sarah)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing S. Art Hasan as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to DKS Systems, LLC, Keith Hochschild, Keith's Computer Services, Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp., Brent Sinn. (MMP)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Copyright/Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1541 (JNE/TNL). (MMP)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6933337) filed by CCDB Partners d/b/a TourPro Software. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bushnell, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CCDB Partners v. DKS Systems, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Starz Dance Competition Corp.
Represented By: Kate L Homolka
Represented By: Kevin P Hickey
Represented By: Jonathan C Marquet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Sinn
Represented By: Kate L Homolka
Represented By: Kevin P Hickey
Represented By: Jonathan C Marquet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DKS Systems, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Duncan McDougall
Represented By: Kelly C Dohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith's Computer Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Hochschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCDB Partners d/b/a TourPro Software
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCDB Partners
Represented By: Sarah E Bushnell
Represented By: Jeffrey M Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?