Moser v. Safeco Insurance
Plaintiff: Michael Moser
Defendant: Safeco Insurance
Case Number: 0:2019cv01545
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/9/2019. (HAM)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 7/15/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 6/1/2020. Motions (disp) due by 9/15/2020. Ready for trial due by 12/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/9/2019. (HAM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/9/2019. Pretrial scheduling order will be issued. (HAM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Michael Moser. Jointly Signed by Safeco Insurance.(Whalen, Cory)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney and Substitution (Whalen, Cory)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory P Whalen on behalf of Michael Moser. (Whalen, Cory)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 6/19/2019. (CLB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 0:19-cv-01545 DSD/TNL. (KDS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Safeco Insurance. (Tupa, Brendan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey County, case number 62-CV-19-4180 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6932224) filed by Safeco Insurance. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tupa, Brendan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moser v. Safeco Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance
Represented By: Brendan R Tupa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moser
Represented By: Ronald F Meuser, Jr
Represented By: Cory P Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?