Bares-Brendle v. Graco, Inc.

Plaintiff: Nanette Bares-Brendle
Defendant: Graco, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01546
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 4/1/2020. Motions (disp) due by 5/1/2020. Ready for trial due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/9/2019. (KLL)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/2/2019. (KLL)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Graco, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Nanette Bares-Brendle.(Weiner, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/26/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Graco, Inc.. (Weiner, Joseph)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative and Other Defenses filed by Graco, Inc.. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
June 12, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1546 (WMW/HB). (lmb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County, State of Minnesota, case number None (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6933204) filed by Graco, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Summons & Complant, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Weiner, Joseph)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 ENTRY FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE WITH DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. NEW CASE FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $400, receipt number AMNDC-6933146. (Weiner, Joseph) Modified text on 6/12/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bares-Brendle v. Graco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanette Bares-Brendle
Represented By: Martin B Ho
Represented By: Michael L Puklich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graco, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie D Sarantopoulos
Represented By: Joseph D Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?