Klenotich v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert M Klenotich and Robert M. Klenotich
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Credit One Bank NA and Credit One Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01556
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A.'s ANSWER to Complaint filed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore Roethke on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC. (Roethke, Theodore)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MSK)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Credit One Bank, N.A. answer due 8/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (MSK)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Credit One Financial is a corporate parent of Defendant Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Young on behalf of Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Credit One Bank, N.A.. (Young, Daniel)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Equifax is a wholly-owned subsidiary of Equifax Inc. (Running, Terri) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (kt).
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Running, Terri)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit One Bank, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC. (ACH)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 19-cv-1556 ECT/BRT. (ACH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Credit One Bank NA, Equifax Information Services LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6935654) filed by Robert M Klenotich. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klenotich v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Haugen
Represented By: Terri A Running
Represented By: Theodore Roethke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Daniel J Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M Klenotich
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Klenotich
Represented By: Thomas J Lyons, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?