Munt v Schnell et al
Plaintiff: Joel Munt
Defendant: Jeanne Michels, Sherlinda Wheeler, David Reishus, Glenn D. Lisowy, Sue Farmer, Paul Schnell and Jeff White
Case Number: 0:2019cv01560
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Becky R Thorson
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE Correspondence filed by Joel Munt (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MMG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE'S 7/1/19 Order re #6 Order/Notice to Attorney filed by Joel Munt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(MMG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 RECEIPT number 44641103881 in the amount of $27.69 issued to Joel Munt. (MMG) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/24/2019 (KMH).
July 1, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Prisoner Complaint: scanned in envelope back. (KMH)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE TO ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/1/2019. (MSK) cc: Joel Munt. Modified text on 7/1/2019 (MMP).
June 14, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) cc: Munt Copy of this NEF and WMW'S Practice Pointers. Modified text on 6/14/2019 (MMP).
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 APPENDIX filed by Joel Munt. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Joel Marvin Munt in SUPPORT OF #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Joel Munt.(kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Joel Munt. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joel Munt. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Sue Farmer, Glenn D. Lisowy, Jeanne Michels, David Reishus, Paul Schnell, Sherlinda Wheeler, Jeff White filed by Joel Munt. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (kt) cc: Munt. (kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2019: #5 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/1/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munt v Schnell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Michels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherlinda Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Reishus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn D. Lisowy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Schnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Munt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?