First Choice Global Marketing, Inc. v. Yotrio Corporation
Plaintiff: First Choice Global Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: Yotrio Corporation
Case Number: 0:2019cv01579
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #17 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Cockson, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by First Choice Global Marketing, Inc.. Jointly Signed by First Choice Global Marketing, Inc. and Yotrio Corporation. (Cockson, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 Reply to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Yotrio Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rimas, Vytas)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Cockson, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by First Choice Global Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cockson, Michael)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue . Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/26/2019. (HAM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Yotrio Corporation.(Rimas, Vytas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #10 Sealed Document(s) - #10 Sealed Exhibit 1 Sales Representative Agreement filed by Yotrio Corporation.(Rimas, Vytas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED EXHIBIT 1 Sales Representative Agreement re #9 Declaration in Support filed by Yotrio Corporation.(Rimas, Vytas) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (MMP).
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Haiyan Withers in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Yotrio Corporation.(Rimas, Vytas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Yotrio Corporation.(Rimas, Vytas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Yotrio Corporation. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Rimas, Vytas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue : Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3A (STP) before Judge Nancy E. Brasel. (Rimas, Vytas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss/General , MOTION to Transfer/Change Venue filed by Yotrio Corporation. (Rimas, Vytas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1579 NEB/TNL. (MMG)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yotrio Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Rimas, Vytas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Yotrio Corporations parent corporation is MWH Hong Kong Co., Ltd., which parent corporation is Yotrio Group Co., Ltd. (Rimas, Vytas) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (CLK).
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Minnesota District Court, Fourth Judicial District, Hennepin County, case number 27-CV-19-8607 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6940116) filed by Yotrio Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) Notice of Case Assignment, #3 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rimas, Vytas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Choice Global Marketing, Inc. v. Yotrio Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yotrio Corporation
Represented By: Vytas M Rimas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Choice Global Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F Cockson
Represented By: Dadri-Anne Alecia Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?