Foss v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Courtney Foss
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01580
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Myers, Gregory)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER on #10 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 8/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/22/2019. (TJB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #10 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Courtney Foss. (Myers, Gregory)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER on #7 Stipulation. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/1/2019. (TJB)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Myers, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Plead by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Courtney Foss. (Myers, Gregory)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James P Joseph, II for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/18/2019. (NAH)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1580 JNE/DTS. (MMG)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Joseph II. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6941294, #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Myers, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James P. Joseph II. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6941294 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Experian plc is a corporate parent of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Myers, Gregory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rice County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6941270) filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Myers, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foss v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Foss
Represented By: Anthony P Chester
Represented By: Robert L Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory J Myers
Represented By: James P Joseph, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?