Hansen v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Marie Hansen
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2019cv01587
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Marie Hansen. Andrew Saul served on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (KDS) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (KDS).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Edward Allen Wicklund for Jacqueline Marie Hansen. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2019. (NAH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward A. Wicklund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6972190 filed by Jacqueline Marie Hansen. (Olson, Edward)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (KDS)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/27/2019. (HAM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (KDS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung per Social Security List. Please use case number 19-cv-1587 TNL. (KDS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jacqueline Marie Hansen. (Olson, Edward)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 EXHIBIT A re #1 Complaint. (Olson, Edward) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (ACH).
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Jacqueline Marie Hansen. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hansen v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Marie Hansen
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Represented By: Edward Allen Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?