Braden v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Braden
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2019cv01593
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Braden. U.S. Attorney served on 6/26/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (CLK)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. A notice to withdraw consent has been filed in this case and is now assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1593 NEB/BRT. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (MMG)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Silverman on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Silverman, Marisa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Braden. Andrew Saul served on 6/24/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (Balmer, Stephanie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (MMP)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 6/19/2019. (MSK)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (CLK)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson per Social Security List. Please use case number 19-cv-1593 BRT. (CLK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by James Braden. (Balmer, Stephanie)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by James Braden. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Balmer, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braden v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Braden
Represented By: Stephanie M Balmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Marisa Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?