Barber v. Saul
Plaintiff: Myron L. Barber, Sr.
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill and Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2019cv01595
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Myron L. Barber, Sr. Andrew Saul served on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (CLK)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Saul re #10 Declaration in Support, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #12 Proposed Order to Judge - Other, #11 Meet and Confer Statement, #9 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Silverman, Marisa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Motion to Dismiss #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Silverman, Marisa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Saul.(Silverman, Marisa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Declaration of Michael Sampson in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 and 2)(Silverman, Marisa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Silverman, Marisa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Andrew Saul. (Silverman, Marisa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Andrew Saul re #6 Notice of Appearance (Silverman, Marisa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Silverman on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Silverman, Marisa)
July 10, 2019 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, unclaimed - Address Unknown. Order #4 not re-sent to Myron L. Barber, Sr.(CLK) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (CLK).
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill. (KDS)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/20/2019. (TJB) cc: Barber, Sr. Modified text on 6/24/2019 (KDS).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 cc: Barber(CLK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Myron L. Barber, Sr. (CLK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill filed by Myron L. Barber, Sr. Case assigned to Judge David T. Schultz per Civil (MJ all - Social Security Appeals)list. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) cc: Barber, Sr. (CLK) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (CLK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron L. Barber, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Marisa Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?