Nesenson v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Corey Nesenson
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01596
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTCE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (FF) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen R. Beiting for Electrolux Home Products, Inc.; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Keith L Pryatel for Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/26/2019. (NAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith L. Pryatel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6960586 filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Collins, Grant)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Electrolux North America, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Collins, Grant)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Collins, Grant)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Keith L. Pryatel. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6957809 filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Collins, Grant) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (NAH).
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen R. Beiting. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6957783 filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Collins, Grant)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Stephen R. Beiting, Keith L. Pryatel as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (ACH)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 6th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1596 SRN/LIB. (ACH)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sterns County District Court, case number N/A (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6944588) filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Collins, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nesenson v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Penelope J Phillips
Represented By: Grant T Collins
Represented By: Keith L Pryatel
Represented By: Stephen R. Beiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Nesenson
Represented By: Bryce M Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?