Nowling et al v. SN Servicing Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Nowling and Janice Nowling
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust National Association and SN Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 0:2019cv01605
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Tony N Leung
2 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 2609
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Janice Nowling, Michael Nowling. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Wilcox, Christopher)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Michael Nowling, Janice Nowling. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-10) (Wilcox, Christopher)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, Plaintiff shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by letter or e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/26/2019. (HAM)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association.(Hoffman, Calvin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #11 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association.(Hoffman, Calvin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of James A. Schoeberl in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Hoffman, Calvin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' L.R. 701 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hoffman, Calvin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion to Dismiss : Notice of Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Hoffman, Calvin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss/General Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Hoffman, Calvin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Nowling. U.S. Bank Trust National Association served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/26/2019. (Wilcox, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Nowling. SN Servicing Corporation served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/25/2019. (Wilcox, Christopher) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (kt).
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #4 Stipulation. Defendants SN Servicing Corporation and U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee of the Igloo Series II Trust, have up to and including July 26, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2019. (HAM)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Nancy E. Brasel recused. Case reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1605 PJS/TNL. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/2/2019. (CLK)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Calvin P Hoffman on behalf of SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (Hoffman, Calvin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Stipulation,. (Schoeberl, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association. Jointly Signed by SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, as Trustee of the Igloo Series II Trust, Michael Nowling, and Janice Nowling. (Schoeberl, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SN Servicing Corporation, U.S. Bank Trust National Association. (CLK)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1605 NEB/TNL. (CLK)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SN Servicing Corporation and U.S. Bank Trust National Assocation (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6945567) filed by Michael Nowling, Janice Nowling. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1-9, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilcox, Christopher) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (CLK). Modified text on 6/19/2019 (KDS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nowling et al v. SN Servicing Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust National Association
Represented By: Calvin P Hoffman
Represented By: James Schoeberl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Calvin P Hoffman
Represented By: James Schoeberl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Nowling
Represented By: Christopher Wilcox
Represented By: Daniel M Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Nowling
Represented By: Christopher Wilcox
Represented By: Daniel M Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?