Davis v. Valmont Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wardell Davis
Defendant: Valmont Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01610
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/1/2020. Expert Discovery due by 7/1/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 3/15/2020. Motions (disp) due by 9/1/2020. Ready for trial due by 2/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/13/2019. (TMA)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/13/2019. (TMA)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Wardell Davis. Jointly Signed by Valmont Industries, Inc..(Thome, Joni)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/7/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Abbey Moland for Valmont Industries, Inc.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 6/27/2019. (NAH)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Valmont Industries, Inc.. (Norrie, Jonathan)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Abigail M. Moland. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6962149 filed by Valmont Industries, Inc.. (Norrie, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Valmont Industries, Inc.. (Norrie, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1610 DWF/ECW. (MMG)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Valmont Industries, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Affidavit of Jonathan Norrie (Norrie, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan Norrie re #1 Notice of Removal, byValmont Industries, Inc.. (Norrie, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dakota County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6947637) filed by Valmont Industries, Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Norrie, Jonathan) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Valmont Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valmont Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan P Norrie
Represented By: Abbey Moland
Represented By: Brittany B Skemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wardell Davis
Represented By: Joni M Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?