Saucke v. Everyday Living LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Saucke
Defendant: Everday Living Holdings, LLC, Everyday Living, LLC, Everyday Living LLC and Everyday Living Holdings LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01623
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letter due by 9/4/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MME)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Everyday Living Holdings LLC, Everyday Living LLC. (Sherman, James)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Saucke. Everyday Living Holdings LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (May, Nicholas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melissa Saucke. Everyday Living LLC served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (May, Nicholas)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1623 SRN/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 6/24/2019. (CLK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Everyday Living Holdings LLC, Everyday Living LLC. (CLK)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1623 SRN/TNL. (CLK)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Everday Living Holdings, LLC, Everyday Living, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6950599) filed by Melissa Saucke. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (May, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saucke v. Everyday Living LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everday Living Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everyday Living, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everyday Living LLC
Represented By: James B Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everyday Living Holdings LLC
Represented By: James B Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Saucke
Represented By: Nicholas G B May
Represented By: Lucas Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?