Robinson v. VSI Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jhonathan Jontae Robinson
Defendant: Jay Tutt, Marshall Tutt and VSI Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01628
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David S Doty
Referring Judge: Becky R Thorson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12112
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service for Defendants VSI Construction, Inc., Marshall Tutt, and Jay Tutt. Documents have been mailed to all listed defendants: Order Granting IFP, Complaint, two Waiver of Services (AO 399), and one Prepaid Envelope. Waiver of Service due by 9/9/2019. (KDS)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 8/6/2019. (CLB) cc: Robinson. Modified text on 8/7/2019 (KDS).
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jhonathan Jontae Robinson. (MMP)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Judge Thorson. (MSK) cc: Jhonathan Jontae Robinson. Modified text on 8/2/2019 (MMP).
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk's Office to Jhonathan Jontae Robinson re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Jhonathan Jontae Robinson. (KDS)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Defendant(s) to file answer within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/30/2019. (MSK) cc: Robinson. Modified text on 8/5/2019 (KDS).
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT to #1 Complaint filed by Jhonathan Jontae Robinson.(Attachments: #1 Attachment - Certified Mail Receipt)(MMP) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (MMP). Document QC'd on 7/1/2019 (JGK).
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Jhonathan Jontae Robinson. (MMP)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jay Tutt, Marshall Tutt, VSI Construction, Inc. filed by Jhonathan Jontae Robinson. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Civil Cover Sheet) cc: Jhonathan Robinson (MMP) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. VSI Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Tutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Tutt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSI Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jhonathan Jontae Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?