Weisen v. ANDALE 7700 INC. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Weisen and Jeffrey Weisen
Defendant: 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC. d/b/a Andale Taqueria and Andale Taqueria Y Mercado and ANDALE 7700 INC.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01637
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Donovan W Frank
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 23 EXHIBIT Exhibit C, Part 3 of 3 re #21 Declaration in Support, filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC..(Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 22 EXHIBIT Exhibit C, Part 2 of 3 re #21 Declaration in Support, filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC..(Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 21 Declaration of Julee Quarve-Peterson in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A,B & D, #2 Exhibit(s) C, Part 1 of 3)(Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 20 Declaration of Fernando Mellado-Barboza in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-B)(Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Joseph M. Windler in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-3)(Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC..(Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and for Attorneys Fees and Costs : Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 724 (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Windler, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 Letter re: withdrawal of motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Windler, Joseph)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER - In light of the Amended Complaint filed July 19, 2019 (Doc. No. #12 ), the Court requests that Defendants inform the Court as to the status of their Motion to Dismiss the original complaint (Doc. No. #4 ). Ordered by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 7/26/2019. (las)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. filed by Jeffrey Weisen. No summons requested. (Michenfelder, Patrick)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Windler, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Declaration of Fernando Mellado-Barboza in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC..(Windler, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Julee Quarve-Peterson in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A & B)(Windler, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Joseph M. Windler in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 & 2)(Windler, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Windler, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC..(Windler, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 724 (STP) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Windler, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC.. (Windler, Joseph)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd/4th Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1637 DWF/DTS. (KDS)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC. d/b/a Andale Taqueria and Andale Taqueria Y Mercado. (Windler, Joseph)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6953126) filed by 7700 Partners LLC, ANDALE 7700 INC. d/b/a Andale Taqueria and Andale Taqueria Y Mercado. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Windler, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weisen v. ANDALE 7700 INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7700 Partners LLC
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Represented By: Chelsea Ahmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDALE 7700 INC. d/b/a Andale Taqueria and Andale Taqueria Y Mercado
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDALE 7700 INC.
Represented By: Chelsea Ahmann
Represented By: Joseph M Windler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Weisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Weisen
Represented By: Chad Throndset
Represented By: Patrick W Michenfelder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?