Bennet v. Mayo Clinic et al
Plaintiff: John Bennet
Defendant: Mayo Clinic, Mayo Clinic Hospital - Rochester and Does 1-10
Case Number: 0:2019cv01639
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by John Bennet. Jointly Signed by John Bennet, Mayo Clinic, and Mayo Clinic Hospital-Rochester.(Peterson, Paul)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 10:20 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 734 (STP) before Judge Paul A. Magnuson. (JEP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Bennet. Mayo Clinic Hospital - Rochester served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Peterson, Paul)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Bennet. Mayo Clinic served on 6/25/2019, answer due 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Peterson, Paul)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B Brantingham on behalf of Mayo Clinic, Mayo Clinic Hospital - Rochester. (Brantingham, Andrew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Mayo Clinic, Mayo Clinic Hospital - Rochester. (Ebnet, Nathan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Mayo Clinic, Mayo Clinic Hospital - Rochester. (Ebnet, Nathan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Eugene Fahrenkrog as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Does 1-10, Mayo Clinic, Mayo Clinic Hospital - Rochester. (MMG)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1639 PAM/HB. (MMG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6953355) filed by John Bennet. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Expert Review, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Peterson, Paul) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennet v. Mayo Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bennet
Represented By: Paul D Peterson
Represented By: Anu Chudasama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic
Represented By: Andrew B Brantingham
Represented By: Nathan J Ebnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayo Clinic Hospital - Rochester
Represented By: Andrew B Brantingham
Represented By: Nathan J Ebnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?