Marden's Ark, Incorporated v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Plaintiff: Marden's Ark Incorporated and Marden's Ark, Incorporated
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Case Number: 0:2019cv01653
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint filed by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER on #12 Stipulation. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated answer due 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/19/2019. (TJB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #12 Stipulation. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Lawsuit by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. Jointly Signed by Marden's Ark, Incorporated. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan K. Washburn on behalf of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Washburn, Bryan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A Brennaman on behalf of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Brennaman, Nathan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin L Hoffman on behalf of UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Hoffman, Erin)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Avi Robert Kaufman for Marden's Ark, Incorporated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/9/2019. (JGK)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Avi R. Kaufman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6981896 filed by Marden's Ark, Incorporated. (Kaufman, Avi)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stefan Coleman for Marden's Ark, Incorporated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 6/27/2019. (NAH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stefan Coleman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6963698 filed by Marden's Ark, Incorporated. (Peterson, Ryan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Stefan Coleman, Avi R. Kaufman as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (CLK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1653 PJS/DTS. (CLK)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Plaintiffs (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6956865) filed by Marden's Ark Incorporated. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Peterson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marden's Ark, Incorporated v. UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marden's Ark Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan D. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marden's Ark, Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan D. Peterson
Represented By: Stefan Coleman
Represented By: Avi Robert Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Erin L Hoffman
Represented By: Bryan K. Washburn
Represented By: Nathan A Brennaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?