Lee v. Saul
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lynn Lee
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2019cv01665
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Moss on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Moss, Michael)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Lynn Lee. Andrew Saul served on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (Osterhout, Karl)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Stephanie Lynn Lee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 6/26/2019. (NAH)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (CLK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (CLK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois per Social Security List. Please use case number 19-cv-1665 LIB. (CLK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6959535 filed by Stephanie Lynn Lee. (Olson, Edward)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6959514) filed by Stephanie Lynn Lee. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Michael Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Lynn Lee
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?