MatrixCare Inc. v. Netsmart Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: MatrixCare Inc.
Defendant: Netsmart Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01684
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Michael J Davis
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc.. (Rivard, Ruth)
August 13, 2019 Filing 55 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #53 Exhibit 7 to Amended Complaint filed by MatrixCare Inc.. (Stradley, Paige)
August 8, 2019 Filing 54 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #53 Sealed Document(s) - #53 Sealed Exhibit 7 . (Schultz, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 53 SEALED EXHIBIT Exhibit 7 re #52 Amended Complaint, by Matrixcare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schultz, William)
August 8, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Netsmart Technologies, Inc.. filed by MatrixCare Inc.. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 8, #8 Exhibit(s) 9, #9 Exhibit(s) 10, #10 Exhibit(s) 11, #11 Exhibit(s) 12, #12 Exhibit(s) 13) (Schultz, William) Thumb drive received on 8/8/2019 (JGK).
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 has been RESCHEDULED to 9/24/2019 at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/7/2019. (MME)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1.The Court ADOPTS as modified above the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson dated July 12, 2019 #38 . 2. Plaintiff's MatrixCare Inc.'s Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order #9 is DENIED. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/30/2019. (GRR)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letter due by 9/16/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2019 has been RESCHEDULED to 9/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/29/2019. (MME)
July 26, 2019 Filing 48 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Netsmart Technologies, Inc. re #47 Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation. (Rivard, Ruth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 47 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #42 Report and Recommendation filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc. filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc..(Rivard, Ruth)
July 26, 2019 Filing 46 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by MatrixCare Inc. . (Schultz, William)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER/NOTICE OF PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report, Rule 26 Worksheet, and confidential settlement letters due by 9/4/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 11:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 346 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MME)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 (Text-only) ORDER granting #39 Joint Motion Regarding Continued Sealing. Permanent Sealing GRANTED for Document Number(s): 2. Order on continued sealing becomes final on 8/21/2019 unless further timely submissions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/24/2019. (MME)
July 19, 2019 Filing 43 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations on MatrixCare Inc.'s TRO #42 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (Schultz, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 42 OBJECTION TO #38 REPORT AND RECOMMENTATIONS filed by MatrixCare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schultz, William)
July 18, 2019 Filing 41 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Netsmart LLC is a corporate parent of Defendant Netsmart Technologies, Inc.. (Conneely, Kevin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc.. (Conneely, Kevin)
July 16, 2019 Filing 39 JOINT MOTION REGARDING CONTINUED SEALING re #2 Exhibit 7 to Complaint filed by MatrixCare Inc.. Jointly signed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc.(Schultz, William) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (MMG).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/12/2019. (MSK)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER on #35 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/12/2019. (NCP)
July 12, 2019 Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #35 Stipulation. (Schultz, William)
July 12, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION Regarding Protective Order by MatrixCare Inc.. Jointly Signed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc.. (Schultz, William)
July 10, 2019 Filing 34 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on July 3, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (87 pages). Court Reporter: Carla Bebault. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents.For information on redaction procedures, please review #Local Rule 5.5. Redaction Request due 7/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2019. (CRB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
July 8, 2019 Filing 32 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for a COPY OF TRANSCRIPT #30 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Conneely, Kevin)
July 8, 2019 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 3-Day Transcript of #30 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Carla Bebault. (Schultz, William)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Motion Hearing held on 7/3/2019 re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc. (MSK) Modified text and file date on 7/10/2019 (MMG).
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Netsmart Technologies, Inc. re #25 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc..(Conneely, Kevin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Kevin D. Conneely in Opposition to #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10)(Conneely, Kevin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Vincent D. Koehler, Jr. in Opposition to #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc..(Conneely, Kevin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Christopher San Nicolas in Opposition to #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc..(Conneely, Kevin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Netsmart Technologies, Inc..(Conneely, Kevin)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc. to Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/2/2019. (GRR)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 (Text-only) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/1/2019. (MSK)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (Text-only) ORDER/NOTICE: A telephone conference is hereby set for 7/1/2019 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Counsel should connect and jointly call in to Chambers at 651-848-1210. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 7/1/2019. (MSK)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc. to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/1/2019. (GRR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth A Rivard on behalf of Netsmart Technologies, Inc.. (Rivard, Ruth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D Conneely on behalf of Netsmart Technologies, Inc.. (Conneely, Kevin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc..(Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Mark Lanterman in SUPPORT OF #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc..(Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Weber in SUPPORT OF #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Gary Pederson in SUPPORT OF #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Lawrence G. Green in Support of #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7)(Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Expedited Handling Requested filed by MatrixCare Inc.. (Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MatrixCare Inc.. Netsmart Technologies, Inc. served on 6/27/2019, answer due 7/18/2019. (Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT 8 - Corrected re #1 Complaint,. (Schultz, William)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Netsmart Technologies, Inc. (MMP)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1684 (MJD/SER). (MMP)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. MatrixCare Holdings Inc. is a corporate parent of Plaintiff MatrixCare Inc.. (Schultz, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT INSTEAD OF REDACTED DOCUMENT: Entire Document Confidential for #2 Sealed Document(s) - #2 Sealed Exhibit 7 . (Schultz, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 PLACEHOLDER- SEALED EXHIBIT 7 re #1 Complaint, by MatrixCare Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schultz, William) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (MMG). SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERK'S OFFICE ON 6/26/19. (kt)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Netsmart Technologies, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMNDC-6962340) filed by MatrixCare Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 8, #8 Exhibit(s) 9, #9 Exhibit(s) 10, #10 Exhibit(s) 11, #11 Exhibit(s) 12, #12 Civil Cover Sheet) (Schultz, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MatrixCare Inc. v. Netsmart Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netsmart Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D Conneely
Represented By: Ruth A Rivard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MatrixCare Inc.
Represented By: William D Schultz
Represented By: Paige S Stradley
Represented By: Joseph Dubis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?