Larson Systems, Inc. v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Plaintiff: Larson Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Case Number: 0:2019cv01691
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/15/2019. Fact Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/15/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 4/24/2020. Motions (disp) due by 7/13/2020. Ready for trial due by 11/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/19/2019. (JMK)
August 16, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/16/2019. A written Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JMK)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/16/2019. (JMK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation. (Abide, Leland)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Jointly Signed by Larson Systems, Inc.. (Abide, Leland)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Jointly Signed by Larson Systems, Inc.. (Abide, Leland)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amy Van Horne for Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael McDonnell, III for Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/12/2019. (NAH)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/9/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/12/2019. (JMK)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael T. McDonnell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6990190 filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Abide, Leland)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Selective Insurance Group, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Abide, Leland)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR, WILL BE REFILED - MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael T. McDonnell. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6989755 filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Abide, Leland) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (KNK).
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Amy L. Van Horne. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6989715 filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Abide, Leland)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST/LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Request for new Pretrial Conference date by Larson Systems, Inc.. (Kletscher, Bradley) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (MMG).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/22/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JMK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules.(JMK)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Abide, Leland)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Amy L. Van Horne as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1691 (JNE/HB). (MMP)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Minnesota District Court County of Anoka, case number NA (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6963539) filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A- Part 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. A-Part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Abide, Leland)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson Systems, Inc. v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larson Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley A Kletscher
Represented By: Tyler William Eubank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Represented By: Leland Patrick Abide
Represented By: Michael McDonnell, III
Represented By: Amy Van Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?