Goodman v. Dakota County et al
Plaintiff: Antoine Goodman
Defendant: Dakota County, Sgt. Peterson and Correctional Officer Simpson
Case Number: 0:2019cv01710
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Dakota County, Peterson, Simpson.(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #6 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Dakota County, Peterson, Simpson.(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Dakota County, Peterson, Simpson. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Timmerman, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Dakota County, Peterson, Simpson. (Timmerman, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dakota County, Peterson, Simpson. (lmb)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (Text-only) ORDER Directing Clerk: The Clerk's Office is hereby ordered to issue summons in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/3/2019. (MME)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Dakota County, Peterson, Simpson. (Leyderman, Zorislav)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1710 (PJS/SER). (lmb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Complaint under 42 USC 1983 against All Defendants (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6966281) filed by Antoine Goodman. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Leyderman, Zorislav) Modified event text on 6/28/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. Dakota County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Goodman
Represented By: Zorislav R Leyderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota County
Represented By: Jeffrey A Timmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Peterson
Represented By: Jeffrey A Timmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Simpson
Represented By: Jeffrey A Timmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?