Schug v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rachelle Anne Schug
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 0:2019cv01742
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rachelle Anne Schug. Andrew Saul served on 7/10/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (KDS) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (KDS).
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey Wirmani on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Wirmani, Tracey)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul. (KDS)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2019. (HAM)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karl E. Osterhout for Rachelle Anne Schug. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 7/2/2019. (NAH)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES: Social Security Case Assignment Form Issued. Per #Local Rule 7.2, this form must be submitted to the clerk in paper on or before the answer due date. Please mail the completed form to:U.S. District Court for the District of MinnesotaClerks Office300 South Fourth Street, Suite 202Minneapolis, MN 55415 (KDS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung per Social Security List. Please use case number 19-cv-1742 TNL. (KDS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6972130 filed by Rachelle Anne Schug. (Olson, Edward)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Rachelle Anne Schug. (Olson, Edward)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Rachelle Anne Schug. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Olson, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schug v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachelle Anne Schug
Represented By: Edward C. Olson
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Tracey Wirmani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?