Kelley v. BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Kelley
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,
Case Number: 0:2019cv01756
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #65 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Donald B Verrilli, Jr for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 8/1/2019. (JGK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7033609 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #63 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bradley Schneider for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/31/2019. (NAH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley Schneider. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7029569 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine)
July 26, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Spehr on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Spehr, Richard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Steven Comstock on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Comstock, Christopher)
July 26, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucia Nale on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Nale, Lucia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Yount on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Yount, Joshua)
July 26, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra L. Bogo-Ernst on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Bogo-Ernst, Debra)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lucia Nale for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank.; granting #52 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Debra L. Bogo-Ernst for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank.; granting #53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joshua D. Yount or BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank.; granting #54 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Steven Comstock for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank.; granting #55 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard A. Spehr for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/25/2019. (JGK)
July 24, 2019 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #41 MOTION to Stay filed by Douglas A. Kelley. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Collyard, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard A. Spehr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7017762 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher S. Comstock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015174 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua D. Yount. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015168 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Debra L. Bogo-Ernst. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015142 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lucia Nale. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015067 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. 19-cv-1826 DSD reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and by Judge David S. Doty on 7/22/2019. (kt)
July 19, 2019 Filing 49 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Richard A. Spehr, Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., ELaine J. Goldenberg, Bradley R. Schneider as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
July 17, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank, re #41 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank, re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #42 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #44 Meet and Confer Statement, #41 MOTION to Stay , #46 Proposed Order to Judge, #45 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, (Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 46 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #41 MOTION to Stay filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,.(Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 45 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank, re #43 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,.(Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 44 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #41 Motion to Stay filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,.(Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Support re #41 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,.(Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #41 MOTION to Stay : Date and time to be determined. (Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Stay filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine)
July 11, 2019 Filing 40 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-FILED INTO INCORRECT CASE-WILL REFILE INTO 19-cv-1826. MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6990687 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,. (Momoh, Adine) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (lmb).
July 8, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 3, 2019 Filing 39 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL (kt)
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list. Please use case number 19-cv-1756 WMW. (kt)
July 3, 2019 Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 36 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 3/5/2019. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2019.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 35 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/31/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2019.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 34 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/26/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 6/27/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 32 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/25/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/5/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 3/8/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 2/21/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 9/2/2016. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 1/8/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 12/19/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 25 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 10/25/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/27/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2018.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 23 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 8/23/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2017.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 7/26/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2017.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 21 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 6/28/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2017.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 6/28/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2017.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 5/24/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2017.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/26/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2017.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 1/5/2017. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2017.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 9/2/2016. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2016.(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Opposition brief, #2 Order re motion for sanctions, #3 Notice of filing of official transcript, #4 BNC certificate of mailing, #5 Stipulation, #6 Order re stipulation regarding scheduling order, #7 Motion for summary judgment, #8 Motion to seal, #9 Opposition brief, #10 Motion for sanctions, #11 Exhibits 1-57 to motion for sanctions, #12 Response to motion for sanctions, #13 Order granting motion to seal, #14 Notice of filing official transcript, #15 BNC certificate of mailing, #16 Order denying motion for summary judgment, #17 Opinion, #18 Order granting motion for sanctions, #19 Opinion, #20 BKY Case Docket, #21 Identification of Residence Form)(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-G re plaintiff's motion to seal, #2 Notice of appearance, #3 Expedited motion to seal, #4 Defendant's opposition to motion, #5 Local Rule 7037-1 statement filed by plaintiff, #6 Local Rule 7037-1 Statement filed by defendant, #7 Order denying motion to compel, #8 Order denying motion to seal, #9 Order denying motion to seal, #10 Notice of filing of official transcript, #11 BNC Certificate of mailing, #12 Order re stipulation, #13 BNC certificate of mailing, #14 Stipulation to further amend the scheduling order, #15 Order re stipulation to further amend scheduling order, #16 Motion to compel to strike BMO's unverified response, #17 Opposition brief, #18 Affidavit, #19 Local Rule 7037-1 Joint statement, #20 Letter filed by Keith Moheban, #21 Order granting motion to compel, #22 Notice of filing of official transcript, #23 BNC certificate of mailing, #24 Stipulation, #25 Order re stipulation to further amend the scheduling order, #26 Motion for sanctions)(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Order granting motion to seal, #2 Order regarding discovery, #3 Notice of filing of official transcript, #4 BNC certificate of mailing, #5 Order regarding scope, #6 Stipulation regarding timing of depositions, #7 Order re in camera review, #8 Amended order re in camera review, #9 Order granting motion for leave to file summary judgment motion, #10 Order re amended order re in camera review, #11 Order re stipulation, #12 BNC certificate of mailing, #13 Stipulation to further amend the scheduling order, #14 Affidavit, #15 Order re stipulation to further amend the scheduling order, #16 Order re declaration of Michael D. Rief, #17 Motion to compel, #18 Motion to seal, #19 Memorandum of law in support of its motion to compel)(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 Exhibits A-G, #2 Letter of objection to motion, #3 Letter response, #4 Exhibits F & G to defendant's trial brief, #5 Motion to seal, #6 Plaintiff's response, #7 Defendant's response, #8 Letter regarding settlement, #9 Order authorizing plaintiff to file under seal, #10 Order granting motion to seal, #11 Motion for leave to seek summary judgment, #12 Motion to seal, #13 Notice of filing official transcript, #14 Order re motion for clarification, #15 Order regarding scope of production, #16 BNC certificate of mailing, #17 Letter to court filed by Michael Collyard, #18 Order for status conference, #19 Response to motion, #20 Letter filed by Adine Momoh)(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Notice of appeal and statement of election, #3 Motion for leave to appeal, #4 Clerk's notice of appeal, #5 Response, #6 Support brief, #7 District court clerk's notice of receipt and assignment, #8 Notice of filing of official transcript, #9 Order vacating order, #10 Order to show cause, #11 BNC certificate of mailing, #12 BNC certificate of mailing, #13 Notice of hearing regarding order vacating order, #14 BNC certificate of mailing, #15 Order on appeal from district court, #16 Motion to seal, #17 Part 1 Defendant's memorandum, #18 Part 2 Exhibits A-G, #19 Part 1 Defendant's memorandum)(LH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 BNC Certificate of mailing, #2 Notice of filing official transcript, #3 Statement in response to the requests for information, #4 Response to defendant's statement in response, #5 BNC certificate of mailing, #6 Statement of defendant in response to plaintiff's response, #7 Order setting hearing, #8 Order for sanctions, #9 Stipulation for second supplemental protective order, #10 Notice of filing of official transcript, #11 Second supplemental stipulated protective order, #12 BNC certificate of mailing, #13 Notice of appearance Andrew J. Calica, #14 Status report, #15 Letter requesting a conference, #16 Stipulation for third supplemental stipulated protective order, #17 Third supplemental stipulated protective order, #18 Stipulation to amend the scheduling order, #19 Order for status conference, #20 Local Rule 7037-1 statement of plaintiff, #21 Local Rule 7037-1 of defendant, #22 Order re stipulation to amend scheduling order, #23 Order granting oral discovery motion, #24 Expedited motion for stay pending appeal)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Motion to compel, #2 Motion to compel, #3 Response to motion to compel, #4 Response to motion to compel, #5 Response to motion to compel, #6 Objection to motion to compel, #7 Non-party Ritchie Capital Management LLC Memorandum in Opposition, #8 Joint statement, #9 Joint statement, #10 Notice of Appearance Gina De Tatto, #11 Order granting in part and denying in part motion to compel, #12 Order granting in part and denying in part motion to compel, #13 Order denying motion to compel, #14 Amended order, #15 Notice of filing of official transcript, #16 BNC certificate of mailing, #17 Withdrawal of request for attorneys fees, #18 Motion to compel testimony, #19 Response to motion to compel, #20 Joint statement, #21 Notice of filing of official transcript, #22 BNC certificate of mailing, #23 Order granting in part and denying in part motions to compel, #24 Stipulation regarding motions to compel, #25 Order approving stipulation, #26 Stipulation to amend portion of scheduling order, #27 Supplement to plaintiff's motion to compel BMO to unredact, #28 Order re stipulation to amend portion of scheduling order, #29 Letter re motion to compel, #30 Notice of continued hearing, #31 Plaintiff's response to Federal Reserve's letter, #32 Defendant BMO Harris Bank's Response, #33 Notice of appearance Valerie Stacey, #34 Plaintiff's response to BMO's submission, #35 Order re motion to compel)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Objection to motion to compel, #2 Notice of appearance Lori Zahalka, #3 Letter opposing motion to compel, #4 Objection to motion, #5 Opposition brief memorandum, #6 Opposition brief memorandum, #7 Objection to motion to compel, #8 Joint statement, #9 Order granting motion to seal, #10 Order denying motion for leave to depose incarcerated individuals, #11 Notice of appearance Gary Isaac, #12 Notice of appearance Sherli Furst, #13 Notice of appearance Carley Kessler, #14 Notice of appearance Chelsea Salcker, #15 Notice of filing of official transcript, #16 BNC certificate of mailing, #17 Notice of appearance Ethan Hastert, #18 Motion to compel)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Opposition brief memorandum re response, #2 Affidavit, #3 Memorandum of law in opposition, #4 Joint statement, #5 Order granting motion to seal, #6 Order denying defendant's motion to compel, #7 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #8 BNC Certificate of mailing, #9 Notice of filing of official transcript, #10 BNC Certificate of mailing, #11 Motion to compel BMO to unredact and produce documents, #12 Motion to compel BMO to provide information about any legal hold, #13 Motion to seal, #14 Motion for leave to depose incarcerated individuals)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing of official transcript, #2 BNC Certificate of mailing, #3 Order for status conference regarding motion for revised scheduling order, #4 Order for status conference regarding motion to compel, #5 Notice of filing of official transcript, #6 Notice of filing of official transcript, #7 BNC Certificate of mailing, #8 BNC Certificate of mailing, #9 Order granting in part and denying in part motion to compel, #10 Order granting in part and denying in part motion for revised scheduling order, #11 Motion to compel BMO to admit or deny requests for admission, #12 Motion to compel, #13 Motion to seal, #14 Certificate of service, #15 Opposition brief memorandum)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appearance Peter Ihrig, #2 Motion to compel BMO to produce a 30(b)(6) witness, #3 Support brief regarding motion to compel, #4 Notice of appearance Thomas Panoff, #5 Response to motion to compel, #6 Status report regarding motion to compel, #7 Withdrawal of status report, #8 Joint statement, #9 Notice of filing of official transcript, #10 BNC Certificate of mailing, #11 Order granting in part and denying in part motion to compel, #12 Motion for revised scheduling order, #13 Motion to compel, #14 Affidavit regarding motion, #15 Response to motion, #16 Response to motion to compel, #17 Joint statement)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Order continuing hearing on motion to dismiss, #2 Order for supplemental briefing, #3 Amended order for supplemental briefing, #4 Notice of filing of official transcript, #5 BNC certificate of mailing, #6 Opposition brief memorandum regarding motion to dismiss, #7 Support brief memorandum regarding motion to dismiss, #8 Order regarding filings, #9 Notice of appearance Michael Collyard, #10 Response to opposition brief memorandum, #11 Reply to response, #12 Ritchie's statement regarding its standing to sue BMO, #13 Order granting in part, denying in part motion to dismiss, #14 Opinion, #15 Notice of appearance Christopher Comstock, #16 Notice of Appearance Thomas Panoff, #17 Answer to complaint without demand for jury trial, #18 Notice of appearance Christopher Comstock)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Expedited motion to seal, #2 Expedited notice of continued hearing re motion to seal, #3 Notice of Appearance William Bornstein, #4 Notice of filing of official transcript, #5 Notice of Appearance Michael Reif, #6 BNC Certificate of mailing, #7 Order granting expedited motion to seal, #8 Defendant's response to motion for leave to amend complaint, #9 Plaintiff's reply in support of motion for leave to amend complaint, #10 Order granting plaintiff leave to file first amended complaint, #11 First amended complaint, #12 Motion to dismiss, #13 Order documents filed by noon, #14 BNC certificate of mailing, #15 Response to motion to dismiss, #16 Support brief memorandum regarding motion to dismiss)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Adversary Proceeding Number 12-4288. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance Thomas Kiriakos, #2 Notice of Appearance Joshua Yount, #3 Notice of Appearance Michael Olafson, #4 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney for Terrence J. Fleming and Sandra S. Smalley-Fleming, #5 Stipulation for Amended Protective Order, #6 Order re Stipulation for Amended Protective Order, #7 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #8 Order for Status Conference, #9 Status Report filed by Defendant, #10 Status Report filed by Plaintiff, #11 Notice of Appearance Thomas Hamlin, #12 Notice of Appearance Sarah Friedricks, #13 Supplement to Litigation Status Report filed by Plaintiff, #14 Opposition brief memorandum re status report, #15 Substitution of attorney filed by Thomas Hamlin and Sarah Friedricks, #16 Stipulation regarding litigation schedule, #17 Order regarding stipulation regarding litigation schedule, #18 Notice of Appearance Lucia Nale, #19 Notice of Appearance Michael Reif, #20 Notice of Appearance William Borstein)(LH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 TRANSFER OF ADVERSARY PROCEEDING from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-45257. Adversary Proceeding number 12-4288. filed by Douglas A. Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Defendant to Answer, #5 Order Approving Stipulation to Extend Time, #6 BNC Certificate of Mailing, #7 Notice of Appearance Keith Moheban, #8 Notice of Appearance John Kirtley, #9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #10 Notice of Appearance Sean O'D. Bosack, #11 Notice of Appearance Michael Apfeld, #12 Notice of Appearance Adine Momoh, #13 Stipulation re protective order, #14 Trustee's Notice of Pertinent Dates, #15 Order Granting Motion for Protective Order, #16 Order Modifying Term 6 of the Court's Discovery Stay Modification Order, #17 Order Approving Stipulation for Protective Order, #18 Order Modifying Paragraph 6 of the Court's Discovery Stay Modification Order, #19 Order Re Remaining Procedures for Pending Motions for Partial Summary Judgment, #20 Notice of Appearance Debra Bogo-Ernst) (LH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas A. Kelley
Represented By: Sarah Friedricks
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Represented By: Peter Ihrig
Represented By: Michael A Collyard
Represented By: Michael D Reif
Represented By: Thomas L Hamlin
Represented By: J David Jackson
Represented By: Valerie Anne Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMO Harris Bank N.A., as successor to M&I Marshall and IIsley Bank,
Represented By: Christopher Steven Comstock
Represented By: Keith S Moheban
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Debra L. Bogo-Ernst
Represented By: Joshua D. Yount
Represented By: Thomas Vangel Panoff
Represented By: Adine S Momoh
Represented By: Andrew J Calica
Represented By: Donald B Verrilli, Jr
Represented By: Bradley Schneider
Represented By: Richard A. Spehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?