WiMN Properties 7, LLC v. Kenwood Finance, LLC
Plaintiff: WiMN Properties 7, LLC
Defendant: Kenwood Finance, LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01776
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE: Confidential Letter to Court due by 11/12/2019. Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/29/2019. (TMA)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 11/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Amended Pleadings due by 10/10/2019. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Motions (non-disp) due 2/14/2020. Motions (disp) due by 3/31/2020. Ready for trial due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/29/2019. (TMA)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 8/29/2019. A pretrial conference was held. A scheduling order will be issued. (TMA)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by WiMN Properties 7, LLC. Jointly Signed by Kenwood Finance, LLC.(Drewes, Jonathan)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/22/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kenwood Finance, LLC. (Goerlitz, Jared)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT that Defendant Kenwood Finance, LLC is solely owned by Robert Johnson. (Goerlitz, Jared) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (kt).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1776 NEB/ECW. (kt)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6979911) filed by Kenwood Finance, LLC. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goerlitz, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WiMN Properties 7, LLC v. Kenwood Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WiMN Properties 7, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan L R Drewes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenwood Finance, LLC
Represented By: Jared M Goerlitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?