Pederson v. Frost et al
Plaintiff: Lee Pederson and Lee Michael Pederson
Defendant: Daniel Fisher, Phillip Frost and CoCrystal Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01777
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: David T Schultz
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph T Dixon, III on behalf of Phillip Frost. (Dixon, Joseph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Daniel Fisher re #6 Notice of Appearance (Rimas, Vytas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vytas M Rimas on behalf of Daniel Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rimas, Vytas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lee Michael Pederson. Daniel Fisher waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pederson, Lee)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Lee Michael Pederson. Phillip Frost waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pederson, Lee)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Lee Pederson is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Lee Pederson has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to CoCrystal Pharma, Inc., Daniel Fisher, Phillip Frost. (kt)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CoCrystal Pharma, Inc., Daniel Fisher, Phillip Frost (filing fee $400, receipt number 4-103812) filed by Lee Pederson. Filer requests summons issued. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (lmb) cc: Lee Pederson.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pederson v. Frost et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Fisher
Represented By: Vytas M Rimas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Frost
Represented By: Alethea M Huyser
Represented By: Joseph T Dixon, III
Represented By: John Pavelko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CoCrystal Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Michael Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?