LaFave v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Theresa LaFave
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01801
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on #3 Stipulation. Nationstar Mortgage LLC answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/17/2019. (JLB)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. Jointly Signed by Theresa LaFave. (Kaluza, Kristina)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1801 (ECT/LIB). (MMP)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carlton County District Court, case number 09-CV-19-1176 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6985623) filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC d/b/a Mr. Cooper. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) 2) Notice of Filing of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Kaluza, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFave v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Michael A Stephani
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa LaFave
Represented By: Christopher Wilcox
Represented By: Carl E Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?