Upsher v. Ten Unknown Named Agents/Officers
Plaintiff: Joseph Upsher
Defendant: Ten Unknown Named Agents/Officers, Eddie Miles, Kathy Halvorson, Tom Roy, Shannen Remann, John Hanson, Gregory T. Simon and Minnesota Department of Corrections
Case Number: 0:2019cv01805
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER from Clerk's Office to re: Order Granting IFP and USM Forms to Complete cc: Upsher. (KDS)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #5 Motion for Violation of Civil Rights; granting #7 Application on Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs; denying #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 9/4/2019. (JMK) cc: Upsher. Modified text on 9/5/2019 (KDS).
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Minnesota Department of Corrections, Tom Roy, Gregory T. Simon, John Hanson, Eddie Miles, Kathy Halvorson, Shannen Remann. filed by Joseph Upsher. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Redlined Amended Complaint, #2 Copy of Order and Jail Correspondence) (CLK)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Joseph Upsher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope)(CLK)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #11 Order by Joseph Upsher (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Authorized Prison Official and Inmate Account History Report, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(CLK) Modified text on 8/5/2019 (CLK).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time, and Upsher must provide a certified copy of his jail trust account statement by September 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/2/2019. (KLL) cc: Upsher. Modified text on 8/5/2019 (KDS).
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTINO FOR EXTRA TIME TO RESPOND filed by Joseph Upsher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Envelope, #3 Envelope)(kt)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (JMK) cc: Upsher. Modified text on 7/19/2019 (KDS).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Petition for Assistance for Research and Investigative Services. On the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. 7), Plaintiff Joseph Upsher must provide a certified copy of his jail trust account statement within 20 days of this Order, as directed above, failing which it will be recommended that the case be dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution. Should Upsher fail to submit the required trust account statement, it will be recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 7/18/2019. (JMK) cc: Upsher. Modified text on 7/19/2019 (KDS).
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK) cc: Upsher. Modified text on 7/15/2019 (KDS).
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Upsher re #2 MOTION PETITION FOR ASSISTANCE FOR RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES, #1 Prisoner Complaint, #4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #6 Memorandum, #7 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Upsher, #3 Notice (Other), #5 MOTION (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Upsher re #1 Prisoner Complaint. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Joseph Upsher. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Prisoner Complaint filed by Joseph Upsher.(kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER 42:1983 filed by Joseph Upsher. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Joseph Upsher. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT by Joseph Upsher (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR ASSISTANCE FOR RESEARCH AND INVESTIGATIVE SERVICES filed by Joseph Upsher. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Ten Unknown Named Agents/Officers filed by Joseph Upsher. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (kt)cc: Upsher. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/25/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upsher v. Ten Unknown Named Agents/Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ten Unknown Named Agents/Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Halvorson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannen Remann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory T. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Upsher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?