Acuity v. Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc.
Plaintiff: Acuity
Defendant: Appliance Installers and Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01824
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Michael J Davis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc. (MMG)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acuity. Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc. served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Miller, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Acuity re #9 Declaration, #8 Application for Entry of Default (Miller, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Mark R. Miller re #8 Application for Entry of Default by Acuity . (Miller, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT . (Miller, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Re-Issued as to Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc. (KDS)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc. (lmb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1824 (MJD/HB). (lmb)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Acuity. (Miller, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R Miller on behalf of Acuity. (Miller, Mark)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc. (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6991660) filed by Acuity. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Miller, Mark) Modified text on 7/12/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acuity v. Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appliance Installers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appliance Installers of Minnesota, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acuity
Represented By: Mark R Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?