BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank v. Kelley
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Appellee: Douglas A Kelley
Appellant: BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank
Case Number: 0:2019cv01826
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 38 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Douglas A Kelley . (Collyard, Michael)
August 2, 2019 Filing 37 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank . (Momoh, Adine)
July 29, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of Michael D. Reif in Opposition to #19 MOTION to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Hamlin, Thomas)
July 29, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hamlin, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Spehr on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Spehr, Richard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Steven Comstock on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Comstock, Christopher)
July 26, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucia Nale on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Nale, Lucia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Yount on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Yount, Joshua)
July 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra L. Bogo-Ernst on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Bogo-Ernst, Debra)
July 25, 2019 Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Elaine J. Goldenberg, as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (CLK).
July 25, 2019 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Michael D. Reif in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to BMO Harris's Motion for Leave to Appeal Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-27)(Hamlin, Thomas) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (CLK).
July 25, 2019 Filing 27 PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM Of Law in Opposition to BMO Harris's Motion for Leave to Appeal Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Douglas A Kelley. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Hamlin, Thomas) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (CLK).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lucia Nale for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Debra L. Bogo-Ernst for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joshua D. Yount for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Steven Comstock for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard A. Spehr for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/25/2019. (JGK)
July 24, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank re #19 MOTION to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) (Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank re #22 Meet and Confer Statement, #20 Notice (Other), #19 MOTION to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) , #21 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #23 Proposed Order to Judge (Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #19 MOTION to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.(Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #19 Motion to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #19 MOTION to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank re #19 MOTION to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) (Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Accept Sealed Bankruptcy Documents pursuant to FRBP 8009 (f) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard A. Spehr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7017706 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(SMD)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 3/5/2019. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2019.(SMD)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher S. Comstock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015222 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua D. Yount. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015213 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Debra L. Bogo-Ernst. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015209 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lucia Nale. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015204 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. Case reassigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright for all further proceedings. Senior Judge David S. Doty no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1826 WMW. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright and by Judge David S. Doty on 7/22/2019. (kt)
July 22, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bradley Schneider for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Donald B Verrilli, Jr for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. Approved by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 7/18/2019. (NAH)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6999103 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley R. Schneider. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6996264 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Nancy E. Brasel recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge David S. Doty for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1826 DSD. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/12/2019. (kt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Hamlin on behalf of Douglas A Kelley. (Hamlin, Thomas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL (kt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list. Please use case number 19-cv-1826 NEB. (kt)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(KKN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL for Bankruptcy Court Case Number 12-4288 - Complaint (Attachments: #1 Answer, #2 Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Opposition Brief, #4 Order Denying Motion, #5 Opinion, #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal)(KKN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-45257. Adversary Proceeding number 12-4288. filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Attachments: #1 Identification of Residence Identification of Residence, #2 Docket Sheet) (KKN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank v. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Douglas A Kelley
Represented By: Peter Ihrig
Represented By: Thomas L Hamlin
Represented By: Michael D Reif
Represented By: Valerie Anne Stacey
Represented By: Michael A Collyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank
Represented By: Adine S Momoh
Represented By: Debra L. Bogo-Ernst
Represented By: Keith S Moheban
Represented By: Donald B Verrilli, Jr
Represented By: Christopher Steven Comstock
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Joshua D. Yount
Represented By: Richard A. Spehr
Represented By: Bradley Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?