Kolstad Company, Inc. v. Great Dane LP
Plaintiff: Kolstad Company, Inc.
Defendant: Great Dane LP
Case Number: 0:2019cv01830
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Steven E Rau
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kolstad Company, Inc. (Johnson, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (Text-only) ORDER in Response to #17 Letter to Magistrate Judge. Defendant Great Dane LPs deadline to respond to the Complaint in this matter is hereby extended to August 12, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/12/2019. (MME)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Kolstad Company, Inc. regarding deadlines. (Johnson, Mark)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kolstad Company, Inc. re: extension of deadline to answer complaint. (Johnson, Mark)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kolstad Company, Inc. Great Dane LP served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (MMP)
July 17, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. Great Dane LP served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Johnson, Mark)
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Johnson, Mark) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMP).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing RESCHEDULED for 8/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. Defendant's response brief due no later than August 7, 2019. Plaintiff's reply brief due no later than August 14, 2019. Plaintiff is directed to file and serve an amended notice of hearing on motion. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/15/2019. (ECW)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER to Request Scheduling of a Hearing on #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested . (Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc..(Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Kolstad Company, Inc..(Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Robert Crosson in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E)(Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Holley C. Horrell in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F)(Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 14E (MPLS) before Judge Patrick J. Schiltz. (Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Great Dane LP. (MMG)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1830 PJS/SER. (MMG) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMG).
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Kolstad Company, Inc.. (Johnson, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Great Dane LP (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6992749) filed by Kolstad Company, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kolstad Company, Inc. v. Great Dane LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kolstad Company, Inc.
Represented By: Mark L. Johnson
Represented By: Holley C Horrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Dane LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?