Campbell et al v. City of Rochester, et al
Plaintiff: James Campbell and Sarah Louisell
Defendant: Rochester Economic Development Authority and City of Rochester
Case Number: 0:2019cv01846
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Protective Order. (Benner, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Protective Order by City of Rochester, Rochester Economic Development Authority. (Benner, Robert) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (JME).
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by James Campbell, Sarah Louisell. Jointly Signed by City of Rochester and Rochester Economic Development Authority.(Cann, John)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/5/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KLL)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G Benner on behalf of City of Rochester, Rochester Economic Development Authority. (Benner, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by City of Rochester, Rochester Economic Development Authority. (Benner, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Campbell, Sarah Louisell. City of Rochester served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019; Rochester Economic Development Authority served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (Cann, John)
July 17, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Rochester, Rochester Economic Development Authority. (lmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations, ADA Other) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1846 (WMW/HB). (lmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Rochester, Rochester Economic Development Authority (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6995574) filed by James campbell, Sarah Louisell. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Cann, John) Modified text on 7/15/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell et al v. City of Rochester, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Campbell
Represented By: Jon W Morphew
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kirk A Schnitker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Louisell
Represented By: Jon W Morphew
Represented By: John D Cann
Represented By: Kirk A Schnitker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Economic Development Authority
Represented By: Robert G Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rochester
Represented By: Robert G Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?