Traylor v. Feia
Plaintiff: Raymond J. Traylor, Sr.
Defendant: Andrea L. Feia
Respondent: Commissioner of Corrections/Warden
Case Number: 0:2019cv01849
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Rescanned Petition to include all handwritten pages. (KMH)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #8 Amended Complaint, rescanned to include backside of handwritten Statement of the Claim. (KMH)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) filed by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr. (lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/9/2019 (KMH).
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Andrea L. Feia, filed by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (lmb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/9/2019: #4 Rescanned Amended Complaint) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/9/2019 (KMH). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: (FILED IN ERROR#5 Rescanned Petition) (KMH). Modified text on 9/10/2019 (KNK).
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH.
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Attachment, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope) (kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #6 Rescanned Petition) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/10/2019 (KMH)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER The application to proceed in forma pauperis of Plaintiff Raymond Traylor, #2 , will not be granted at this time; see Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 7/23/2019. (JLB) cc: Traylor with Order, IFP, 42:1983, and 2254 forms. Modified text on 7/24/2019 (MMP).
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr re #3 MOTION HAVE ANDREA FEIA TO RELEASE ALL DOCUMENTATIONS DEALING WITH DNA EVIDENCE IN THIS CASE REGARDING TRIAL AUG 22, 2014 FOR CASE NO. 62-CR-14-3082 OUT OF ST PAUL, MN, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr, #1 Prisoner Complaint, (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION HAVE ANDREA FEIA TO RELEASE ALL DOCUMENTATIONS DEALING WITH DNA EVIDENCE IN THIS CASE REGARDING TRIAL AUG 22, 2014 FOR CASE NO. 62-CR-14-3082 OUT OF ST PAUL, MN filed by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr. (JGK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Andrea L. Feia filed by Raymond J. Traylor, Sr. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd-4th Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK)cc: Traylor Document QC'd by KMH on 7/23/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Traylor v. Feia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea L. Feia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond J. Traylor, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Commissioner of Corrections/Warden
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?