Brooks v. Brooks et al
Plaintiff: Phillip Brooks
Defendant: Brooks Funeral Home, Inc., George Brooks, 862 Concordia, LLC and Estate of David Brooks, The
Case Number: 0:2019cv01857
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Joan N Ericksen
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Phillip Brooks (Dosdall, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 7/17/2019. (CBC)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ilbert Phillips as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 862 Concordia, LLC, George Brooks, Brooks Funeral Home, Inc., Estate of David Brooks, The. (lmb)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1857 (JNE/SER). (lmb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 862 Concordia, LLC, Brooks Funeral Home, Inc., George Brooks, Estate of David Brooks, The, (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-6997239) filed by Phillip Brooks. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Dosdall, Andrew) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Brooks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Funeral Home, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 862 Concordia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of David Brooks, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Brooks
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Dosdall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?