Meyer v. Firmenich Incorporated
Plaintiff: William Meyer
Defendant: Firmenich Incorporated
Case Number: 0:2019cv01866
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: David T Schultz
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Firmenich Incorporated. Jointly Signed by William Meyer.(Christensen, Corey)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 9/3/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/3/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 8/2/2019. (TJB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2019: #1 Exhibit(s) Consent) (TJB).
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Defendant Firmenich Incorporated's parent is Fragar (America) SA, which owns 10% or more of its stock. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (CLK).
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Firmenich Incorporated. (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1866 ECT/DTS. (kt)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ramsey, case number 0000 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6998345) filed by Firmenich Incorporated. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service) (Sarantopoulos, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Firmenich Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firmenich Incorporated
Represented By: Stephanie D Sarantopoulos
Represented By: Corey Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Meyer
Represented By: Ryan H Ahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?