BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank v. Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust
Appellant: BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank
Appellee: Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust
Case Number: 0:2019cv01869
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elaine J. Goldenberg. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7144730 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #47 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Meryl Holt for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/11/2019. (JGK)
September 5, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Meryl Holt. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7126418 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
September 3, 2019 Filing 46 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust . (Collyard, Michael)
September 3, 2019 Filing 45 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank / Letter to Judge Wright re: case management considerations. (Gleeson, John)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #43 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Donald B Verrilli, Jr for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 8/1/2019. (JGK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Donald B. Verrilli, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7033628 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #41 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bradley Schneider for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/31/2019. (NAH)
July 30, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley Schneider. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7029599 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 30, 2019 Filing 40 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust . (Collyard, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 39 LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank / Letter to Judge Wright requesting a conference. (Gleeson, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Noelle E. Lyle on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Lyle, Noelle)
July 29, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Schaper on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Schaper, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John Gleeson on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Gleeson, John)
July 29, 2019 Filing 35 OBJECTION re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, Plaintiff's Opposition to BMO's Objections to the Bankruptcy Court's Order Granting the Trustee's Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Collyard, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #26 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John Gleeson for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank; granting #27 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Schaper for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank; granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Noelle E. Lyle for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/29/2019. (NAH)
July 26, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Spehr on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Spehr, Richard)
July 26, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Steven Comstock on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Comstock, Christopher)
July 26, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucia Nale on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Nale, Lucia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Yount on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Yount, Joshua)
July 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Debra L. Bogo-Ernst on behalf of BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Bogo-Ernst, Debra)
July 26, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noelle E. Lyle. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7023079 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 26, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Schaper. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7023058 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John Gleeson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7023012 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 25, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE OF RECEIPT AND ASSIGNMENT IN RE: BANKRUPTCY TRANSMITTAL re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (MMP)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lucia Nale for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Debra L. Bogo-Ernst for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joshua D. Yount or BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher Steven Comstock for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.; granting #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Richard A. Spehr for BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/25/2019. (JGK)
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Stay filed by Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Collyard, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard A. Spehr. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7017791 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D Reif on behalf of Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust. (Reif, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(1), the Clerk of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota gives notice that the record for this appeal is available electronically.(SMD)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 3/5/2019. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/4/2019.(SMD)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 4/5/2018. Court Reporter: Kathy Barksdale. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2018.(SMD)
July 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L Hamlin on behalf of Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust. (Hamlin, Thomas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher Comstock. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015287 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua D. Yount. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015261 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Debra L. Bogo-Ernst. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015250 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lucia Nale. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7015239 filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Ihrig on behalf of Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust. (Ihrig, Peter)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Anne Stacey on behalf of Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust. (Stacey, Valerie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Collyard on behalf of Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust. (Collyard, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Lucia Nale, Debra L. Bogo-Ernst, Joshua D. Yount,Christopher S. Comstock, Richard A. Spehr, Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Elaine J. Goldenberg, Bradley R. Schneider as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (MMP)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank re #3 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank re #3 MOTION to Stay , #6 Meet and Confer Statement, #4 Notice of Hearing on Motion, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #3 Motion to Stay filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank.(Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #3 MOTION to Stay : Date and time to be determined. (Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Momoh, Adine)
July 17, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Master list. Please use case number 19-cv-1869 WMW. (MMG)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of APPEAL from United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Minnesota. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-45257. Adversary Proceeding number 12-4288. filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Notice on Appeal, #2 Election to U.S. District Court, #3 Identification of Residence, #4 Order On Appeal, #5 Opinion, #6 Objection, #7 Complaint, #8 Summons, #9 Adversary Docket, #10 Bankruptcy Docket) (SMD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank v. Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: BMO Harris Bank N.A., as Successor to M&I Marshall and Ilsley Bank
Represented By: Keith S Moheban
Represented By: Christopher Steven Comstock
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: John Gleeson
Represented By: Debra L. Bogo-Ernst
Represented By: Meryl Holt
Represented By: Noelle E. Lyle
Represented By: Donald B Verrilli, Jr
Represented By: Michael Schaper
Represented By: Bradley Schneider
Represented By: Joshua D. Yount
Represented By: Adine S Momoh
Represented By: Richard A. Spehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Douglas A Kelley, in his capacity as the Trustee of BMO Litigation Trust
Represented By: Thomas L Hamlin
Represented By: Michael D Reif
Represented By: Peter Ihrig
Represented By: Michael A Collyard
Represented By: Valerie Anne Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?