Pierce v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christopher Pierce
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01874
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Eric C Tostrud
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 (Text-only) ORDER - Pursuant to email communications from the parties in this matter on 8/15/2019, the Pretrial Conference has been RESCHEDULED for 9/24/2019 at 03:00 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/15/2019. (JLB)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly P. Magnus on behalf of Menard, Inc.. (Magnus, Kelly)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 02:00 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1874 (ECT/LIB). (MMP)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Tomsche on behalf of Menard, Inc.. (Tomsche, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Menard, Inc.. (Tomsche, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County District Court, case number 82-cv-19-3476 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7000155) filed by Menard, Inc. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tomsche, Steven) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (MMP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Steven E Tomsche
Represented By: Kelly P. Magnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pierce
Represented By: Alicia N Sieben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?