New Vision Co-op et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Berkley National Insurance Company and New Vision Co-op
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01875
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Referring Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER in Response to #13 Letter to Magistrate Judge IT IS ORDERED THAT:1.The parties request for a continuance is GRANTED.2.The parties shall file their stipulation and proposed order within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/20/2019. (TMA)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Berkley National Insurance Company, New Vision Co-op . (Penny Sayler, Amie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff New Vision Co-op. (Penny Sayler, Amie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Berkley Insurance Company is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Berkley National Insurance Company. W.R. Berkley Corporation is a publicly-held corporation owning 10 percent or more of stock of Plaintiff Berkley National Insurance Company. (Penny Sayler, Amie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amie E. Penny Sayler on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Penny Sayler, Amie)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/22/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 09:30 AM in Judge's Chambers, Suite 342 (STP) before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TMA)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karen M Keeler for Union Pacific Railroad Company; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anastasia Wagner for Union Pacific Railroad Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/19/2019. (NAH)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anastasia Wagner. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7004576 filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Kennedy, Ann)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Karen M. Keeler. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7004540 filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Kennedy, Ann)
July 17, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Karen M. Keeler, Anastasia Wagner as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (CLK)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1875 WMW/ECW. (CLK)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED ANSWER to filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Kennedy, Ann)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Kennedy, Ann)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7000732) filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kennedy, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Vision Co-op et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Ann E Kennedy
Represented By: Anastasia Wagner
Represented By: Karen M Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley National Insurance Company
Represented By: Amie E. Penny Sayler
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: David M Dahlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Vision Co-op
Represented By: Amie E. Penny Sayler
Represented By: Sheri Lillian Stewart
Represented By: David M Dahlmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?