Rogan v. Minnesota Department of Corrections Facility et al
Plaintiff: Michael. Guy. Rogan and Michael Guy Rogan
Defendant: Virginia Dr. Mandac, Minnesota Department of Corrections Facility and Dr. Virginia Mandac
Case Number: 0:2019cv01880
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Leo I Brisbois
2 Judge: Patrick J Schiltz
3 Judge: Wilhelmina M Wright
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 19cv1881 JRT/KMM has been reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim and Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 9/6/2019. (MMG) cc:Michael. Guy. Rogan. Modified text on 9/9/2019 (MMG).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (Text-Only) ORDER Upon review of the Notice #3 , Motion #4 , and Memorandum #5 , the Court instructs the Clerk's Office to strike these items as FILED IN ERROR. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 8/30/2019. (JLB) cc: NEF to Michael Guy Rogan. Modified text on 8/30/2019 (lmb).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz and Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois for all further proceedings. Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright, Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 19-cv-1880 (PJS/LIB). Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 7/19/2019, Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 7/22/2019 and Judge Michael J. Davis on 7/24/2019. (MMP) cc: Michael. Guy. Rogan. Modified text on 7/24/2019 (MMP).
July 18, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. cc: Rogan along with a copy of Magistrate Judge Bowbeer's Practice Pointers. (JMK) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (MMP).
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Michael. Guy. Rogan re #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Michael. Guy. Rogan.(JGK) Document QC'd on 8/21/2019 (MMG).
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael. Guy. Rogan re #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael. Guy. Rogan, #4 MOTION , #3 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint, #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion (JGK) Document QC'd on 8/21/2019 (MMG).
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 FILED IN ERROR Per Order 9 filed 8/30/2019. MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION filed by Michael. Guy. Rogan.(JGK) Document QC'd on 8/21/2019 (MMG). Modified text on 8/30/2019 (lmb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 FILED IN ERROR Per Order 9 filed 8/30/2019. MOTION filed by Michael. Guy. Rogan. (JGK) Document QC'd on 8/21/2019 (MMG). Modified text on 8/30/2019 (lmb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 FILED IN ERROR Per Order 9 filed 8/30/2019. NOTICE by Michael. Guy. Rogan (JGK) Document QC'd on 8/21/2019 (MMG). Modified text/link on 8/30/2019 (lmb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michael. Guy. Rogan. (JGK) Document QC'd on 8/21/2019 (MMG).
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 42 USC 1983 COMPLAINT against Virginia Dr. Mandac, Minnesota Department of Corrections Facility filed by Michael. Guy. Rogan. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd/4th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. (Attachments: #1 Discovery, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Rogan. Modified text on 7/17/2019 (JGK).Document QC'd on 8/21/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogan v. Minnesota Department of Corrections Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Dr. Mandac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Department of Corrections Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Virginia Mandac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael. Guy. Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Guy Rogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?