Tomelleri v. MPLS/STP Clothing Co. L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri and Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: MPLS / STP Clothing Co L.L.C. d/b/a Northmade Co. and MPLS/STP Clothing Co. L.L.C.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01908
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Tony N Leung
Referring Judge: John R Tunheim
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT ON DETERMINATION OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office mailed a copy of the AO 121 and the Judgement to the U.S Copyright Office.) (lmb)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Joseph R. Tomelleri of Dismissal (Stowman, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT ON FILING OF COPYRIGHT ACTION (The Clerk's Office will mail a copy of the AO 121 and the Complaint to the U.S Copyright Office.). (Stowman, Jeffrey) cc: Copyright Office. Modified text on 7/24/2019 (JME).
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Copyright, Trademark) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 19-cv-1908 (JRT/TNL). (lmb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MPLS/STP Clothing Co. L.L.C. (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7007294) filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. No summons requested. ATTACHMENT/EXHIBIT 1 FILED IN ERROR-DIRECTED TO REFILE AS SEPARATE EVENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Report on Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Stowman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (lmb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. MPLS/STP Clothing Co. L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPLS / STP Clothing Co L.L.C. d/b/a Northmade Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPLS/STP Clothing Co. L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R Tomelleri
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Stowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Stowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?