State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Broan-Nutone LLC
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Case Number: 0:2019cv01919
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Leo I Brisbois
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 10/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Edward J. Devitt Courtroom (STP) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anamarie Reyes Kolden on behalf of State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. (Kolden, Anamarie)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3 (DUL) before Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(JLB)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Broan-Nutone LLC. (Carrigan, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Nortek, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant Broan-Nutone LLC. (Carrigan, Timothy)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Broan-Nutone LLC. (Carrigan, Timothy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company. Broan-Nutone LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Theesfeld, Steven)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Broan-Nutone LLC. (MMG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 19-cv-1919 SRN/LIB. (MMG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint,. (Theesfeld, Steven) Modified text on 7/23/2019 (MMP).
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Broan-Nutone LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7010563) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company Filer requests summons issued. (Theesfeld, Steven) Modified text on 7/22/2019 (MMG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company v. Broan-Nutone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Carrigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Steven L. Theesfeld
Represented By: Anamarie Reyes Kolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?