Wilson v. Fikes
Petitioner: Robert Hugh Wilson
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Case Number: 0:2019cv01942
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Katherine M Menendez
Referring Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 OBJECTION TO #4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Robert Hugh Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KDS)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Robert Hugh Wilson, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Robert Hugh Wilson filed by Robert Hugh Wilson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/27/2019. (KAT) cc: Robert Hugh Wilson. Modified text on 8/27/2019 (ACH).
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Bildtsen on behalf of Fikes. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bildtsen, Ann)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Robert Hugh Wilson. (JGK) Document QC'd/Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ACH).
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Robert Hugh Wilson. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 5th Prisoner list, referred to Magistrate Judge Kate M.Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JGK) cc: Wilson. Document QC'd/Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ACH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Fikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Hugh Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Fikes
Represented By: Ana H Voss
Represented By: Ann M Bildtsen
Represented By: Lisa D Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?