Gustafson v. Bolin et al
Petitioner: Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr.
Respondent: William Bolin and Keith Ellison
Case Number: 0:2019cv01963
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Susan Richard Nelson
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr., #12 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF ASSERTION FOR MINNESOTA RULE 144 filed by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr., #2 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Compel MOTION EVIDENTIARY HEARING filed by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 9/18/2019. (TMA) cc: Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr. Modified text on 9/18/2019 (lmb).
August 16, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr re #13 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF ASSERTION FOR MINNESOTA RULE 144 (CLK) Document QC'd on 9/11/2019 by KMW.
August 16, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF ASSERTION FOR MINNESOTA RULE 144 filed by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(CLK) Document QC'd on 9/11/2019 by KMW.
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION FOR REVIEW OF ASSERTION FOR MINNESOTA RULE 144 filed by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLK) Document QC'd on 9/11/2019 by KMW.
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Schmidt on behalf of William Bolin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmidt, Jonathan)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Keith Ellison Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Frank, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Keith Ellison re #5 Notice of Appearance, #8 Proposed Order to Judge, #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General 07/31/2019 (Frank, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Keith Ellison.(Frank, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Keith Ellison. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Frank, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Keith Ellison. (Frank, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Frank on behalf of Keith Ellison. (Frank, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: Scanned envelope back. (KMH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Expanding the Record MOTION EVIDENTIARY HEARING (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/29/2019 (KMH).
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION for Discovery MOTION for Expanding the Record MOTION EVIDENTIARY HEARING filed by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, #2 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Part 2)(CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/29/2019 (KMH).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Discovery, MOTION FOR EXPANDING THE RECORD, MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING filed by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 7/29/2019 (KMH).
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (filing fee $5, receipt number 4-104011) filed by Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per Civil (5th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope) cc: Gustafson, Jr. (CLK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2019: #4 Scanned envelope back) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 7/29/2019 (KMH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gustafson v. Bolin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Bolin
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Represented By: Jonathan P Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith Ellison
Represented By: Matthew Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Duane Gustafson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?