Haynes v. United HealthCare Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Dennis Haynes
Defendant: United HealthCare Insurance Company
Case Number: 0:2019cv01970
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Paul A Magnuson
Referring Judge: Steven E Rau
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. is a corporate parent of Defendant United HealthCare Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by United HealthCare Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Daniel Keenan Ryan for United HealthCare Insurance Company. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/7/2019. (NAH)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER: In re dispositive motion practice in cases assigned to Judge Magnuson, signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on October 1, 2014. (JEP)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United HealthCare Insurance Company. United HealthCare Insurance Company waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Santos, Margaret)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel K. Ryan. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7042329 filed by United HealthCare Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Ann Santos on behalf of United HealthCare Insurance Company. (Santos, Margaret)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United HealthCare Insurance Company. (MMG)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1970 PAM/SER. (MMG)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United HealthCare Insurance Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7021842) filed by Dennis Haynes. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kemmitt, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. United HealthCare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle Alan Eidsness
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Represented By: Margaret Ann Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Haynes
Represented By: Michael John Kemmitt
Represented By: Stephen J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?