Rottworks, LLC v. Auction.com, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rottworks, LLC
Defendant: Auction.com, LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Minnesota Home Venture, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2019cv01978
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Minnesota
Presiding Judge: Hildy Bowbeer
Referring Judge: Nancy E Brasel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Rottworks, LLC of Dismissal with Prejudice (Christensen, Carl)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Rottworks, LLC of Dismissal with Prejudice (Christensen, Carl)
August 22, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (JMK)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Auction.com, LLC (Kaluza, Kristina)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation . (Dobie, Kevin)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER on #5 Stipulation, #3 Stipulation. Defendant Minnesota Home Venture, Inc.'s Answer due 8/16/19; Defendant Federal Home Lone Mortgage Corporation's Answer due 8/16/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 8/2/2019. (KLL)
August 2, 2019 (Text-Only) NOTICE - Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have been recently revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from Local Rules. (KLL)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #5 Stipulation. (Christensen, Carl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Rottworks, LLC. Jointly Signed by Minnesota Home Venture, Inc.. (Christensen, Carl)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #3 Stipulation. (Dobie, Kevin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Jointly Signed by Rottworks LLC. (Dobie, Kevin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1978 (NEB/HB). (MMP)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anoka County District Court, case number 02-CV-19-4086 filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dobie, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Minnesota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rottworks, LLC v. Auction.com, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auction.com, LLC
Represented By: Kristina Kaluza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Kevin T Dobie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Home Venture, Inc.
Represented By: Paul W Fahning
Represented By: John Michael Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rottworks, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Wilcox
Represented By: Carl E Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?